Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domingo Valentín Guerra Arteaga y Leiba

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1660BornAriano, Italy
4 Aug 170646.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 172565.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amida
31 Mar 172666.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Amida
8 Mar 172868.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Segovia, Spain
29 May 174282.3DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Domingo Valentín Guerra Arteaga y Leiba:
Archbishop Domingo Valentín Guerra Arteaga y Leiba (born , died ) Bishop of Segovia

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 43, Number 164

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013