Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Álvaro Eugenio Cardinal de Mendoza Caamaño y Sotomayor

Deceased

Patriarch of West Indies

Titular Archbishop of Pharsalus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1671BornMadrid, Spain
Jul 1715³43.6Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 173462.1AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
20 Jan 173462.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pharsalus
9 May 173462.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Pharsalus
10 Apr 174775.4Elevated to Cardinal
23 Jan 176189.1DiedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Álvaro Eugenio de Mendoza Caamaño y Sotomayor:
Álvaro Eugenio Cardinal de Mendoza Caamaño y Sotomayor (born , died ) Patriarch of West Indies

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
  • a cardinal for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Apr 1747
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 52, Number 220
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015