Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Esteban Noriega, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Bishop of Solsona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1684BornSalamanca
27 Jan 173853.7AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
20 Apr 173853.9Ordained BishopBishop of Solsona, Spain
10 May 173955.0DiedBishop of Solsona, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Esteban Noriega:
Bishop José Esteban Noriega O. Praem. (born , died ) Bishop of Solsona

  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 55, Number 243

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013