Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe Aguado y Requejo

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1684³BornSan Martín de Rubiales
30 Aug 173450.1AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
7 Nov 173450.3Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
3 Nov 173753.3DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Felipe Aguado y Requejo:
Bishop Felipe Aguado y Requejo (born , died ) Bishop of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 52, Number 224
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 30
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015