Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastián Lorenzo Pizarro, O.S.Bas. †

Deceased

Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1676³BornMorente, Spain
17 Mar 172751.1AppointedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
29 Feb 172852.0Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
23 Jul 173660.4DiedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastián Lorenzo Pizarro:
Bishop Sebastián Lorenzo Pizarro O.S.Bas. (born , died ) Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 321
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 45, Number 179
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015