Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan de Galabis, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1683³BornRobledillo de Gata, Spain
17 Sep 172946.3SelectedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
28 Nov 172946.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
Apr 1731³47.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
17 Dec 173754.5SelectedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
3 Mar 173854.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
14 Nov 173956.5DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Galabis:
Archbishop Juan de Galabis O. Praem. (born , died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1700, Page 50, Number 206
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 187
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 216

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015