Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benito Pañelles Escardó, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1670³BornVillafranca del Penedés
24 Jul 173060.4AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
17 Sep 173060.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mallorca, Spain
26 Nov 174373.8DiedBishop of Mallorca, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benito Pañelles Escardó:
Bishop Benito Pañelles Escardó O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Mallorca

  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 48, Number 198
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 272

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015