Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Jiménez Cascante

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1669³BornCascante
1696¹26.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jun 172555.5AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
9 Sep 172555.8Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
13 Dec 173061.0DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Jiménez Cascante:
Bishop Bernardo Jiménez Cascante (born , died ) Bishop of Barcelona

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 43, Number 162
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 36
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 114

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015