Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Felipe Analso Miranda y Ponce de León

Deceased

Bishop of Teruel


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Sep 1720AppointedBishop of Teruel, Spain
15 Dec 1720Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel, Spain
20 Aug 1731DiedBishop of Teruel, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Felipe Analso Miranda y Ponce de León:
Bishop Pedro Felipe Analso Miranda y Ponce de León (died ) Bishop of Teruel

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,645
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 38, Number 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013