Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Francisco Navarro Salvador y Gilabert

Deceased

Bishop of Albarracin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1684³BornCalatayud
2 Jun 170824.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 172742.8AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
18 Apr 172843.9Ordained BishopBishop of Albarracin, Spain
12 May 176580.9DiedBishop of Albarracin, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Francisco Navarro Salvador y Gilabert:
Bishop Juan Francisco Navarro Salvador y Gilabert (born , died ) Bishop of Albarracin

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 74
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 46, Number 183
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015