Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Ignacio Añoa Busto

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1684Born
26 Mar 172238.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Nov 173551.6SelectedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
19 Dec 173551.8ConfirmedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
8 Apr 173652.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pamplona, Spain
24 Sep 174258.5AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
22 Feb 176479.9DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Ignacio Añoa Busto
Archbishop Francisco Ignacio Añoa Busto (born , died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceViana

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 54, Number 234
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 136, and Page 325
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018