Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Gómez

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1697³BornRillo
10 Dec 175356.7AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
21 Apr 175457.0Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
14 Oct 175457.5DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Gómez:
Bishop José Gómez (born , died ) Bishop of Zamora

  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 72, Number 347
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 449

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015