Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Sánchez Sardinero

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1702BornTalavera de la Reina
11 Mar 174340.8AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
8 Mar 174441.8Ordained BishopBishop of Huesca, Spain
5 May 177573.0DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Sánchez Sardinero:
Bishop Antonio Sánchez Sardinero (born , died ) Bishop of Huesca

  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 62, Number 288
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 320

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Nov 2015