Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Lario Lancis

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1712BornTorrecilla del Rebollar
26 Sep 175745.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zaragoza, Spain
26 Sep 175745.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lete
11 Dec 1757³45.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lete
20 Aug 176451.9AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
6 Sep 177764.9DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Lario Lancis:
Archbishop Juan Lario Lancis (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,219
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 76, Number 376

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 26 Oct 2013