Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Rivera Higuera, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Barbastro, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1688Born
4 Aug 175567.0AppointedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
5 Oct 175567.2Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
18 Mar 176677.6DiedBishop of Barbastro, Spain

MicroData Summary for Diego Rivera Higuera
Bishop Diego Rivera Higuera O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of Barbastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLlerena
Ordained BishopMadrid

  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 73, Number 354
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 32
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 115
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 2,978

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast