Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martín Delgado Cenarro y Lapiedra

Deceased

Bishop of Valladolid


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1677³BornValmaseda
23 Sep 174365.8AppointedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
24 Nov 174366.0Ordained BishopBishop of Valladolid, Spain
22 Dec 175376.0DiedBishop of Valladolid, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martín Delgado Cenarro y Lapiedra:
Bishop Martín Delgado Cenarro y Lapiedra (born , died ) Bishop of Valladolid

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,648
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 62, Number 286
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 41
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 430

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015