Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomé Sarmentero, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1696BornVega de Aldetronco
17 Jul 175255.9AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
8 Oct 175256.1Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
6 Dec 177579.2DiedBishop of Vic, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé Sarmentero:
Bishop Bartolomé Sarmentero O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Vic

  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 70, Number 339

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014