Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Armañá Font, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1718³Born
22 Sep 174224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
20 Jun 176850.0AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
28 Aug 176850.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
14 Feb 178566.6AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
4 May 180384.9DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Armañá Font
Archbishop Francisco Armañá Font O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillanueva y La Geltrú

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 86, Number 433
  • d: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,768, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 266, and Page 394

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast