Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tomás Crespo Agüero

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1668BornRucandio
16 Jul 172152.6AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
Nov 1721²52.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ceuta, Spain
17 Mar 172758.2AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
3 Mar 174273.2DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomás Crespo Agüero:
Archbishop Tomás Crespo Agüero (born , died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

  • a bishop for 20.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 132, and Page 354
  • b/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,879
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 40, Number 144
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015