Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Nogués

Deceased

Bishop of Jaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1692BornAlbelda
24 Mar 173441.6AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
6 Oct 173846.2DiedBishop of Jaca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Nogués:
Bishop Ramón Nogués (born , died ) Bishop of Jaca

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,328
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 53, Number 225

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015