Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Vicente Cebrián y Agustín

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1691³BornZaragoza
9 Jun 173240.6AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
24 Aug 173240.9Ordained BishopBishop of Coria, Spain
24 Sep 174250.9AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
30 May 175260.6DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Vicente Cebrián y Agustín:
Bishop Miguel Vicente Cebrián y Agustín (born , died ) Bishop of Córdoba

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,491
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 51, Number 214
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 157, and Page 183

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015