Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Espinosa de los Monteros, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jaca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1671Born
20 Sep 172856.8AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
21 Nov 172856.9Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
4 May 173361.4DiedBishop of Jaca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Espinosa de los Monteros
Bishop Pedro Espinosa de los Monteros O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Jaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlmajano

  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 46, Number 187
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,728, Number 51
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 224

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast