Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspar Miranda Argáiz

Deceased

Bishop of Pamplona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1687³BornCalahorra
24 Sep 174255.6AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
11 Nov 174255.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pamplona, Spain
11 Dec 176780.8DiedBishop of Pamplona, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspar Miranda Argáiz:
Bishop Gaspar Miranda Argáiz (born , died ) Bishop of Pamplona

  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1700, Page 61, Number 283
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 41
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 325

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015