Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego García de Medrano

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1692BornRobledo de Chavela
24 Sep 174250.7AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
16 Dec 174250.9Ordained BishopBishop of Segovia, Spain
Mar 1752³60.1DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego García de Medrano:
Bishop Diego García de Medrano (born , died Mar 1752) Bishop of Segovia

  • a bishop for 9.2 years

Source(s):
  • ob/c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,882
  • b/c34: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 62, Number 284
  • b/c34: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 42
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 373

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015