Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Domingo Manzano Carvajal

Deceased

Bishop of Jaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1676²BornJaraiz de la Vera
4 May 173963.3AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
21 Jun 173963.4Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
5 Sep 175074.6DiedBishop of Jaca, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Domingo Manzano Carvajal:
Bishop Juan Domingo Manzano Carvajal (died ) Bishop of Jaca

  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,493
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,522
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 58, Number 261

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015