Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustín (Filippo) Vázquez Varela, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Solsona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1722Born
17 Jun 179371.1AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
10 Nov 179371.5Ordained BishopBishop of Solsona, Spain
11 Feb 179471.7DiedBishop of Solsona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Agustín (Filippo) Vázquez Varela
Bishop Agustín (Filippo) Vázquez Varela O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Solsona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNovelúa
Ordained BishopPoblet

  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 110, Number 577
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1793, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 158
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,546

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast