Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio José Salinas y Moreno, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tortosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1732BornHellín
29 Mar 179058.0AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
11 Jul 179058.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tortosa, Spain
11 Jun 181482.3DiedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio José Salinas y Moreno
Bishop Antonio José Salinas y Moreno O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Tortosa

  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 195
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 107, Number 559
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 22 Feb 2016