Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustín Benito Torres, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Albarracin, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1724Born
29 Mar 179066.0AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
16 May 179066.1Ordained BishopBishop of Albarracin, Spain
21 May 179268.1DiedBishop of Albarracin, Spain

MicroData Summary for Agustín Benito Torres
Bishop Agustín Benito Torres O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Albarracin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValladolid

  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 72
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 107, Number 557
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,790, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast