Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Porras y Termes

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1708BornMelias
26 Sep 175344.9AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
11 Nov 175345.1Ordained BishopBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
16 Jun 176455.7DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Andrés Porras y Termes:
Bishop Andrés Porras y Termes (born , died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,307
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1700, Page 72, Number 346
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015