Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Pérez Prado y Cuesta

Deceased

Bishop of Teruel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1677BornAranda de Duero
14 Aug 173254.7AppointedBishop of Teruel, Spain
7 Dec 173255.0Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel, Spain
9 Jul 175577.6DiedBishop of Teruel, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Pérez Prado y Cuesta:
Bishop Francisco Pérez Prado y Cuesta (born , died ) Bishop of Teruel

  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 51, Number 218

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Sep 2014