Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Díaz Santos y Bullón

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1687Born
1 Apr 174860.3AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
30 Jun 174860.5Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
25 May 175062.4AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
17 Aug 176173.7AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
17 Feb 176476.2DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Díaz Santos y Bullón
Archbishop Francisco Díaz Santos y Bullón (born , died ) Archbishop of Burgos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuardo

  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 65, Number 309
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 43
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 115, and Page 134
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 374

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018