Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe Martín Ovejero

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1698Born
22 Jul 175052.4AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
6 Sep 175052.6Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
30 Oct 175355.7DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Felipe Martín Ovejero
Bishop Felipe Martín Ovejero (born , died ) Bishop of Oviedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillamartín de Campos

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 69, Number 327
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 41
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 322

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018