Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Francisco Manrique Lara

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1703BornAlmoguera
22 Sep 174945.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
22 Sep 174945.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Geras
16 Nov 174946.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Geras
1 Apr 175450.4AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
21 Apr 176056.5AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
18 Jan 176561.2DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Francisco Manrique Lara:
Bishop Juan Francisco Manrique Lara (born , died ) Bishop of Plasencia

  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 67, Number 318
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 224, and Page 322
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 340, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015