Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bartolomé Rajoy Losada

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1690³BornPuentedeume
19 Jul 175160.9AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
12 Sep 175161.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
17 Jul 177281.9DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé Rajoy Losada:
Archbishop Bartolomé Rajoy Losada (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 70, Number 334
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 176

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 26 Oct 2013