Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Antonio Riomol y Quiroga

Deceased

Bishop of Mondoñedo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1697Born
17 Nov 175255.0AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
4 Mar 175355.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
1 Mar 176163.3DiedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Carlos Antonio Riomol y Quiroga
Bishop Carlos Antonio Riomol y Quiroga (born , died ) Bishop of Mondoñedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Martin de Folgosa

  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 289
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 71, Number 341
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,753, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast