Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidoro Cossío y Bustamente Diaz Santos

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Valladolid, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1700Born
16 Sep 175454.3AppointedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
30 Nov 175454.5Ordained BishopBishop of Valladolid, Spain
26 Feb 176867.7ResignedBishop of Valladolid, Spain
11 Apr 177473.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Valladolid, Spain

MicroData Summary for Isidoro Cossío y Bustamente Diaz Santos
Bishop Isidoro Cossío y Bustamente Diaz Santos (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Valladolid

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuardo

  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 72, Number 349
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 43
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 430

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018