Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Luengo Pinto

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1706BornMorales de Campos
17 Dec 176458.9AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
21 Apr 176559.2Ordained BishopBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
17 Apr 178478.2DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Luengo Pinto:
Bishop Juan Luengo Pinto (born , died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 82, Number 411
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 8 Dec 2015