Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Manuel Cornel

Deceased

Bishop of Barbastro, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1725Born
19 Apr 177348.0AppointedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
18 Jul 177348.3Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
8 Oct 178964.5DiedBishop of Barbastro, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Manuel Cornel
Bishop Juan Manuel Cornel (born , died ) Bishop of Barbastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCerler

  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 90, Number 461
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 24
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018