Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Lay y Anzano, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1716³BornHuesca
17 Feb 177760.5AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
4 May 177760.7Ordained BishopBishop of Albarracin, Spain
11 Dec 178064.3AppointedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
14 Jul 178164.9DiedBishop of Segorbe, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Lay y Anzano:
Bishop Lorenzo Lay y Anzano O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Segorbe

  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 72, and Page 374
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 93, Number 480

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 26 Oct 2013