Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín Antonio Sánchez Ferragudo

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1716Born
17 Jun 177155.2AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
28 Jul 177155.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lérida, Spain
4 Apr 178367.0DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Antonio Sánchez Ferragudo
Bishop Joaquín Antonio Sánchez Ferragudo (born , died ) Bishop of Lérida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRevilla de Campos

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 88, Number 449
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 243

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018