Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Manuel Argüelles

Deceased

Bishop of Palencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1712Born
6 Apr 176148.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
6 Apr 176148.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Botrys
6 Sep 176148.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Botrys
12 Mar 177057.3AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
26 Jun 177966.6DiedBishop of Palencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Manuel Argüelles
Bishop Juan Manuel Argüelles (born , died ) Bishop of Palencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalamanca

  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 79, Number 393
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1761, Number 25
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 128, and Page 325
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018