Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Garrido de la Vega

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1713BornSan Martín de Berducido
18 Jul 176350.1AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
18 Sep 176350.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mallorca, Spain
30 Mar 177258.8AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
20 Jan 177662.6DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Garrido de la Vega:
Bishop Francisco Garrido de la Vega (born , died ) Bishop of Córdoba

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 80, Number 403

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013