Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Fernández Játiva

Deceased

Bishop of Urgell


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1704³BornCasas Ibáńez
21 Mar 176358.6AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
12 Jun 176358.8Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
22 Apr 177166.6DiedBishop of Urgell, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Fernández Játiva:
Bishop Francisco Fernández Játiva (born , died ) Bishop of Urgell

  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1700, Page 80, Number 401
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 427

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015