Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Patricio de la Cuesta Velarde

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1713Born
7 Apr 175643.0AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
12 Sep 175643.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ceuta, Spain
17 Aug 176148.4AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
7 Jun 176855.2DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Patricio de la Cuesta Velarde
Bishop José Patricio de la Cuesta Velarde (born , died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTudanca

  • a bishop for 11.7 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,885
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 74, Number 360
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,756, Number 33
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 374, and Page 376

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast