Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Molina Lario y Navarro

Deceased

Bishop of Málaga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1722³BornCamañas
9 Dec 176543.8AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
20 Apr 176644.1Ordained BishopBishop of Albarracin, Spain
29 Jan 177653.9AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
5 Jun 178361.3DiedBishop of Málaga, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Molina Lario y Navarro:
Bishop José Molina Lario y Navarro (born , died ) Bishop of Málaga

  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 72, and Page 274
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 83, Number 419

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 26 Oct 2013