Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Sáenz de Bururaga

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1707³BornBerricano
14 Jun 176255.3AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
21 Sep 176255.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
25 Jan 176860.9AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
14 May 177770.2DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Sáenz de Bururaga:
Archbishop Juan Sáenz de Bururaga (born , died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 136, and Page 266
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 80, Number 398
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015