Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Lasala y Locela, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Solsona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1716BornVinaroz
14 Dec 176751.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
14 Dec 176751.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
20 Mar 176851.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
15 Mar 177356.6AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
17 Jun 179275.9DiedBishop of Solsona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Rafael Lasala y Locela:
Bishop Rafael Lasala y Locela O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Solsona

  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 65, and Page 158
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 452
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 85, Number 430

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 26 Oct 2013