Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Tormo Juliá

Deceased

Bishop of Orihuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1721BornAlbaida
21 Mar 176341.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
21 Mar 176341.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricomia
25 Sep 176341.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricomia
1 Jun 176846.4AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
26 Nov 179068.9DiedBishop of Orihuela, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Tormo Juliá:
Bishop José Tormo Juliá (born , died ) Bishop of Orihuela

  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 81, Number 405

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 26 Oct 2013