Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Albornoz Tapia

Deceased

Bishop of Orihuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1702BornValencia
1728²25.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 176058.8AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
22 Feb 176159.0Ordained BishopBishop of Orihuela, Spain
22 Jan 176764.9DiedBishop of Orihuela, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Albornoz Tapia:
Bishop Pedro Albornoz Tapia (born , died ) Bishop of Orihuela

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 78, Number 387
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1761, Number 39
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 319

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015