Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Blas Roldán, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1694BornArganda del Rey
13 Mar 175863.9AppointedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
23 Apr 175864.0Ordained BishopBishop of Segorbe, Spain
6 Apr 177076.0DiedBishop of Segorbe, Spain

MicroData Summary for Blas Roldán:
Bishop Blas Roldán O.S.H. (born , died ) Bishop of Segorbe

  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 77, Number 380

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015